This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 11:03:29 (UTC).

BARSTOW COMM HOSPITAL-V-YOLANDA HUFF

Case Summary

On 12/21/2009 BARSTOW COMM HOSPITAL-V-YOLANDA HUFF was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0878

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARSTOW COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Defendant

YOLANDA HUFF

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON & WONG LAW GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/22/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2010

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketUnserved; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 06/18/2010; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO YOLANDA HUFF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketProof of Service UNSERVED Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO YOLANDA HUFF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2010

DocketUnserved; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 06/09/2010; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO YOLANDA HUFF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2010

DocketProof of Service UNSERVED Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO YOLANDA HUFF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2010

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2010

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2010

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2010

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2010

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2009

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20091222-2806; ConversionPayment; $220.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2009

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2009

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $220.00; Total Payments and Credits: $220.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2009

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2009

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2009

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2009

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091222-2806-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT 091222-2806-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 149278

[+] Read More [-] Read Less