Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 02:58:36 (UTC).

BARNUM -V- SOLBERG, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2011 BARNUM filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SOLBERG. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3578

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

CARL L BARNUM III

Defendants and Respondents

PHILLIP SOLBERG

WILMA SOLBERG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

TIMOTHY L TAGGART

999 N. Pacific Street A Bldg- Box 1

Oceanside, CA 92054

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • REMITTITUR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • APPEAL IS DISMISSED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • APPEAL IS DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • APPELLATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • APPELLATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE; STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • WRIT RETURNED -- ( FROM ORA UNSATIS 0 COSTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • APPELLATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING OF BANKRUPTCY STAY FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • APPELLATE ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS OF APPEAL FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY PHILLIP SOLBERG, WILMA SOLBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/17/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PHILLIP SOLBERG SERVED ON 03/18/11 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CARL L BARNUM III FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/17/2011 OF CARL BARNUM - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAGGART, TIMOTHY L