Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 02:59:49 (UTC).

BARNUM -V- BAUTISTA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2011 BARNUM filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BAUTISTA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3579

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARL L BARNUM III

Defendants

LETICIA BAUTISTA

MARIA HALSTEAD

ROSEMEAD INSURANCEAGENCY, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY L TAGGART

999 N. Pacific Street A Bldg- Box 1

Oceanside, CA 92054

Defendant Attorney

SALISBURY LAW GROUP

3720 South Susan Street Suite 110

South Coast Metro, CA 92704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • SUBPOENAS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS (AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL)/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; COURT REPORTER KERRI DAVERSA 13882; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER COUNSEL, THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SANCTIONS IS; HEREBY VACATED AND THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CARL L BARNUM III FOR FAX FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE SANCTIONS AND REQUEST TO RECONSIDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS TIMOTHY L TAGGART FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING CARL L BARNUM III FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED/SANCTIONS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LISA SALISBURY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARIA HALSTEAD.; TIMOTHY L TAGGART FOR CARL L BARNUM III NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT HAS READ AND REVIEWED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY L TAGGART.; DEFENSE COUNSEL REPRESENTS THAT MATTER HAS SETTLED (CONDITIONAL) AND PAYMENTS ARE BEING; MADE TIMELY.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $250.00 PAYABLE TO THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 01/20/16.; DEFENSE COUNSEL REQUESTS $500.00 IN SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL BE AWARDED. COURT TO; CONSIDER REQUEST AT THE NEXT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS (AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL)/DISMISSAL SET FOR 01/20/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CARL L BARNUM III FOR FAX FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $10.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2011
  • HEARING RE: COURT FEES; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER RACHEL ESPARZA 11963; COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CARL L BARNUM III, LETICIA BAUTISTA, MARIA HALSTEAD; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IN CAMERA HEARING WAS SET RE: COURT COSTS/WAIVER.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR HIS ATTORNEY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • FILE SENT TO S38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • COPY OF DENIED FEE WAIVER ORDER MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/17/2011 OF CARL BARNUM - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • COMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less