Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 23:53:21 (UTC).

BARNUM, III -V- SUPER BURRITO

Case Summary

On 08/03/2011 BARNUM, III filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SUPER BURRITO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9315

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARL L BARNUM III

Defendants

SUPER BURRITO

ART SANTOYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY L TAGGART

999 N. Pacific Street A Bldg- Box 1

Oceanside, CA 92054

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2013
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: REACTIVATE CASE CORRECTED DEF NAME/SHORTEN TIME; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT/SETTLEMENT FILED BY COURTCALL FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. (IMAGED); Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CARL L BARNUM III FOR EX PARTE IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REACTIVATE CASE CORRECT DE FT NAME OR TO SHORTEN TIME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • COURT ORDERS MATTER STAYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUPER BURRITO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CARL L BARNUM III FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 08/03/2011 OF CARL BARNUM - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAGGART, TIMOTHY L