Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/13/2018 at 16:11:26 (UTC).

BARNUM III -V- BROWN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2011 BARNUM III filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0409

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

CARL L BARNUM III

Defendants and Respondents

BROWN MINI STORAGE

HAROLD BROWN

DENISE BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

TIMOTHY L TAGGART

999 N. Pacific Street A Bldg- Box 1

Oceanside, CA 92054

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ELBERT W MUNCY

831 West Main

Barstow, CA 92311

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2014
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED ON 04/14/14 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 03/14/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 03/14/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • APPEAL FILED 10/04/2012 OF CARL BARNUM COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY HAROLD BROWN, DENISE BROWN, BROWN MINI STORAGE, FOR 83.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • REMITTITUR IS AFFIRMED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • EXHIBITS RETURNED FROM APPEALS: ORIGINAL # 17, 18, 19 & 20 - COLOR PHOTOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • OPINION RECEIVED FROM THE APPELLATE DIVISION AND ROUTED TO SB CIVIL FOR REVIEW/FILE BACK PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • RECEIPT OF RECORDS/EXHIBITS 17, 18, 19 & 20 FILED 07/25/13

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC CMC SMMNS CMPLT YOU DONT HAVE TO SUE PKT FILED AS TO HAROLD BROWN. PARTY SERVED ON 09/13/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC CMC SMMNS CMPLT YOU DONT HAVE TO SUE PKT FILED AS TO BROWN MINI STORAGE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/13/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CARL L BARNUM III IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CARL L BARNUM III FOR NEW CIVIL FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less