This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 08:41:12 (UTC).

BARLOW -V- THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Case Summary

On 06/09/2010 BARLOW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0447

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKIE BARLOW

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CLARENCE D WHITE

THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

DESIGN SPACE MODULAR BUILDINGS, INC.

DESIGN SPACE MODULAR BUILDINGS, INC

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CLARENCE D. WHITE

DESIGN SPACE MODULAR BUILDINGS, INC

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES

5950 Canoga Avenue Suite 550

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHRIEFFER, P K

100 N Barranca Ave Ste 1100 Eastland Tower

West Covina, CA 91791

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr., Ste. 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

COUNTY COUNSEL, MATTHEW J MARNELL

385 North Arrowhead Ave 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

MARSHALL & FRENCH

17901 Von Karman Ave Suite 300

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 06/09/2010 OF JACKIE BARLOW FILED BY JACKIE BARLOW, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JACKIE BARLOW, ON 10/24/12; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED ORIGINAL DOCUMENT, CANNOT ACCEPT PHOTOCOPIES OF SIGNATURES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2010 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ON 10/05/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON; COURT REPORTER LINDA MEEKINS 10195; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; ATTORNEY INFORMATION; ATTORNEY ROBERT MARSHALL (OFFICE TELECOM) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OSC IS CONTINUED FOR SUBMITTED DISMISSALS TO BE PROCESSED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/14/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF CLARENCE WHITE FILED BY CLARENCE D WHITE, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CLARENCE D WHITE, ON 10/02/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/07/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 10/05/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JACKIE BARLOW FOR STIP TO CONTINUE; Minutes; Receipt: 120831-2747 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RUTH E STRINGER ACTING COUNTY COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • ANSWER IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. PARTY SERVED ON 07/22/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. PARTY SERVED ON 07/07/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100609-3766 $355.00; 100609-3766-CK Reference Number 2441

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • ADA LETTER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • COMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.