This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:21:42 (UTC).

BARCLAYS -V- NAGLER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BARCLAYS -V- NAGLER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8055

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

CERINA R NAGLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER, APC

P.O. Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CERINA R NAGLER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CERINA R NAGLER.

DECLARATION RE: ISO CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: ISO CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CERINA R NAGLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,641.47 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,950.97; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CERINA R NAGLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,641.47 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,950.97; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ISO CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CERINA R NAGLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO CERINA R NAGLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CERINA R NAGLER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,641.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0691 $240.00; 170915-0691-CK Reference Number 54664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less