This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:48:17 (UTC).

BARCLAYS-V-HILLIARD

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BARCLAYS-V-HILLIARD was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7935

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

CRICKETT H HILLIARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER APC

P O Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CRICKETT H HILLIARD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $11,061.60 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $449.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,511.10; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CRICKETT H HILLIARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CRICKETT H HILLIARD SERVED ON 12/19/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0257 $380.00; 170918-0257-CK Reference Number 50762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $11,061.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less