This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:55:19 (UTC).

BARCLAYS -V- GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BARCLAYS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7958

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

PASCUAL GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE,APC.

P.O. Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PASCUAL GOMEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,265.21 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,574.71; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: ACCPEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: ACCPEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCURED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCURED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PASCUAL GOMEZ.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PASCUAL GOMEZ.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PASCUAL GOMEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PASCUAL GOMEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PASCUAL GOMEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,265.21 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,574.71; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCPEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCURED INTEREST FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PASCUAL GOMEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO PASCUAL GOMEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,265.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0679 $240.00; 170915-0679-CK Reference Number CK 52176

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less