This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:18:07 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE V GHASSAN S AYASS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GHASSAN S AYASS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8050

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

GHASSAN S AYASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Suite 160

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GHASSAN S AYASS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GHASSAN S AYASS FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO DOES ONLY

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GHASSAN S AYASS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,531.67 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $312.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,843.67; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

BILLING STATEMENT FILED.

BILLING STATEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED

DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GHASSAN S AYASS SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH FEES OF $72.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GHASSAN S AYASS SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH FEES OF $72.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( FOR THE AMOUNT OF 2868.67 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180507-1037 $25.00; 180507-1037-CK Reference Number 553953

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GHASSAN S AYASS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO GHASSAN S AYASS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GHASSAN S AYASS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,531.67 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $312.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,843.67; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • BILLING STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GHASSAN S AYASS SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH FEES OF $72.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0817 $240.00; 170915-0817-CK Reference Number CK-539778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant