This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 05:46:27 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK VS FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/05/2011 BANK OF NEW YORK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY,

Defendant

THERESA M FERNANDEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, ROSENTHAL, W ITHEM & ZEFF

16027 Ventura Blvd, Suite 201

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SENT TO ATTY VIA SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 110223-0052 $25.00; 110223-0052-CK Reference Number 40458

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BARRY LEE OCONNOR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT THERESA M FERNANDEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; CAUSE SETTLED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THERESA M FERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: THERESA M FERNANDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 03/04/11.; NO PREVAILING PARTY FOR CREDIT REPORTING PURPOSES; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR ABSTRACT ISS AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/05/2011 OF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/05/2011 OF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY,, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY THERESA M FERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY THERESA M FERNANDEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON THERESA M FERNANDEZ FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY THERESA M FERNANDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110120-2636 $0.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • RECEIPT #201101202514 COPIES & CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110107-2360 $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110105-3541 $255.00; 110105-3541-CK Reference Number 39984

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.