This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:08:04 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA -V- TANA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 BANK OF AMERICA -V- TANA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8660

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

KENNETH R TANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Suite 160

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: MILITARY STATUS & CCP 1033 FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: MILITARY STATUS & CCP 1033 FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/01/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH R TANA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,870.45 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $452.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,322.45; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KENNETH R TANA FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KENNETH R TANA FILED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KENNETH R TANA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $72.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KENNETH R TANA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $72.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: MILITARY STATUS & CCP 1033 FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/01/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH R TANA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,870.45 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $452.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,322.45; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KENNETH R TANA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AS TO KENNETH R TANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KENNETH R TANA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $72.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,870.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0863 $380.00; 170929-0863-CK Reference Number 540202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less