This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 02:20:40 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA -V- RAFIEPOUR

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAFIEPOUR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7563

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

SAYEDHASSAN ALAVI RAFIEPOUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER APC

P O Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 10/12/17 AS TO SUTTEL & HAMMER, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 10/12/17 AS TO SUTTEL & HAMMER, FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SAYEDHASSAN ALAVI RAFIEPOUR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY SAYEDHASSAN ALAVI RAFIEPOUR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SAYEDHASSAN ALAVI RAFIEPOUR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SAYEDHASSAN ALAVI RAFIEPOUR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 10/12/17 AS TO SUTTEL & HAMMER, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SAYEDHASSAN ALAVI RAFIEPOUR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0598 $240.00; 170915-0598-CK Reference Number 51221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,579.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less