This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 02:20:25 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA -V- LEEDHAM

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BANK OF AMERICA -V- LEEDHAM was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7560

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

DANIEL R LEEDHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEY AT LAW

151 Bernal Road Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DANIEL R LEEDHAM WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DANIEL R LEEDHAM WITH COSTS OF $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DANIEL R LEEDHAM WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DANIEL R LEEDHAM WITH COSTS OF $59.50

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DANIEL R LEEDHAM WITH COSTS OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DANIEL R LEEDHAM WITH COSTS OF $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0376 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,344.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 12/31/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0169 $380.00; 170915-0169-CK Reference Number 736518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less