This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:57:33 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA -V- GREEN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7980

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

ANTOINETTE MARIE GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Suite 160

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: Pre-D Complete

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:38; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF COUNSEL.; REASON: COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED SETTLEMENT. PARTIES ARE IN THE; PROCESS OF SIGNING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND THEN WILL FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 (SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 07/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

DECLARATION RE: OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

NOTICE OF DATE, TIME, AND PLACE OF OSC FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

NOTICE OF DATE, TIME, AND PLACE OF OSC FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

AMENDED SUMMONS * FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS * FILED.

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 05/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:48; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANTOINETTE MARIE GREEN WITH COSTS OF $72.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANTOINETTE MARIE GREEN WITH COSTS OF $72.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0684 $240.00; 170915-0684-CK Reference Number 538842

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 (SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FOR FAX FILING, COPIES, POSTAGE & ENVELOPE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180702-0135 $4.21; 180702-0135-MC Reference Number #033-0074949257

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:38; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF COUNSEL.; REASON: COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED SETTLEMENT. PARTIES ARE IN THE; PROCESS OF SIGNING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND THEN WILL FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 (SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 07/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DATE, TIME, AND PLACE OF OSC FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 05/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:48; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANTOINETTE MARIE GREEN WITH COSTS OF $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,718.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0684 $240.00; 170915-0684-CK Reference Number 538842

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant