This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 12:17:20 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA -v- BARNES

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARNES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1022

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendants

JERRY BARNES

JERRY BARNES II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

5011 Dudley Blvd, Bldg 250, Bay G

Mcclellan, CA 95652

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/TSC; Disposition: Continued

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/TSC; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR NELSON & KENNARD FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; COUNSEL REPRESENTS MATTER HAS SETTLED AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS CIRCULATING. COUNSEL; REQUEST A CONTINUANCE.; COURT ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO FILE A NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT WIHTIN 30 DAYS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:55; ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON OSC REL STATUS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON OSC REL STATUS FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

WITHDRAWAL OF MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

MOTION RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 12/12/17 AS TO NELSON+ KENNARD, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 12/12/17 AS TO NELSON+ KENNARD, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JERRY BARNES II; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JERRY BARNES II; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JERRY BARNES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $72.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JERRY BARNES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $72.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/19/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THE PARTIES REACHED SETTLEMENT HOWEVER DEFENDANT HAS; BREACHED SETTLEMENT TERMS.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 2 HOUR(S).; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL TO PROVIDE COPY TO DEFENDANT/DEFENDANT; COUNSEL.; BENCH TRIAL ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C) (F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/19/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. IS SET FOR 01/15/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:49; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/TSC; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR NELSON & KENNARD FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; COUNSEL REPRESENTS MATTER HAS SETTLED AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS CIRCULATING. COUNSEL; REQUEST A CONTINUANCE.; COURT ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO FILE A NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT WIHTIN 30 DAYS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:55; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • MOTION RE: NOTICE OF AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JERRY BARNES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $72.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,258.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0061 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less