This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:27:41 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA-V-AGUNOS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BANK OF AMERICA-V-AGUNOS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7877

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

VICTORIA L AGUNOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER APC

P O Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTORIA L AGUNOS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,141.32 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,450.82; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VICTORIA L AGUNOS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VICTORIA L AGUNOS.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VICTORIA L AGUNOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VICTORIA L AGUNOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTORIA L AGUNOS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,141.32 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,450.82; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VICTORIA L AGUNOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AS TO VICTORIA L AGUNOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VICTORIA L AGUNOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,841.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0242 $240.00; 170915-0242-CK Reference Number 51729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less