This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 23:13:05 (UTC).

BANIANI-V-WIDNER

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 BANIANI-V-WIDNER was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1382

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BORZOO BANIANI

Defendant

DONA WIDNER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • WRIT RTD IN ENV PROVIDED BY ATTY *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION ONLY); Minutes; Receipt: 110620-2646 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; PATRICK L SINGER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN BOUZANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF BORZOO BANIANI PRESENT; DEFENDANT DONA WIDNER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; BORZOO BANIANI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DONA WIDNER IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; CAUSE SETTLED.; STIPULATED JUDGMENT RECEIVED/SIGNED AND FILED.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ENTERED; STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED -- SEE STIPULATION FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF BORZOO BANIANI ORDERED ENTERED 06/16/11; JUDGMENT FOR: BORZOO BANIANI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DONA WIDNER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $520.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $300.00 AND DAMAGES $520.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,740.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DONA WIDNER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT OF POSSESSION SHALL ISSUE FORTHWITH BUT WITH NO FINAL LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 07/05/11. IF DEFENDANT; VACATED THE PREMISES PRIOR TO 07/05/11 MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE $0. IF DEFENDANT DOES NOT; VACATE THE PREMISES ON OR BEFORE 07/05/11 MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE $1740.; DEFENDANT WILL NOT CAUSE ANY INTENTIONAL DAMGES TO PREMISES.; AGREEMENT IS NOT BE REPORTED TO ANY CREDIT AGENCY.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • REQ TO SET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/04/11 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF BORZOO BANIANI AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF BORZOO BANIANI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DONA WIDNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DONA WIDNER IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DONA WIDNER FOR FIRST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY DONA WIDNER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4291 $255.00; 110504-4291-CK Reference Number 175688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less