This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:48:03 (UTC).

BAKER RECOVERY-V-GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 BAKER RECOVERY-V-GOMEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9604

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAKER RECOVERY SERVICES

Defendant

JOSE GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JUANA TREJO

1535 E. 17Th St. Ste. 106

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/SANCTIONS/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:34; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO; $50.00 FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(E).TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE; IMPOSED IS $140.00; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/SANCTIONS/TSC SET FOR 05/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:34; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,009.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BAKER RECOVERY SERVICES FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BAKER RECOVERY SERVICES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171010-0458 $196.00; 171010-0458-CK Reference Number 2733

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less