This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:30:51 (UTC).

BAHENA-V-ESTATE OF BAHENA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 BAHENA-V-ESTATE OF BAHENA was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9493

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRIAM P BAHENA

Defendants

ESTATE OF MARIO BAHENA

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIMON PC

415 W Foothill Blvd Suite 202

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDANCY ACTIONS FILED.

COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDANCY ACTIONS FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(FAILURE TO FILE DFLT JUDG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF CITATION. NEWSPAPER SAN BERNARDINO SUN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIRIAM P BAHENA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MIRIAM BAHENA, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MIRIAM BAHENA, ESTATE OF MARIO BAHENA REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(FAILURE TO SERVE)/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY OMERO BANUELOS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT A PROBATE FILING WAS NEVER OPENED AS TO THE ESTATE OF; MARIO BAHENA, SO AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS FILED NAMING "ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN..." AS THE; DEFENDANT. COUNSEL FURTHER REPRESENTS HE HAS ALSO SUBMITTED AN APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE; THE DEFENDANT BY PUBLICATION TO THE COURT.; THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED; FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO PROCEED WITH A DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THE AUTHORITY THAT GIVES THE COURT; JURISDICTION TO PROCEED WITH THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS AGAINST "ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN..." AT; THE TIME OF THE DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(FAILURE TO FILE DFLT JUDG) SET FOR 12/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIRIAM P BAHENA FOR APP AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION; Minutes; Receipt: 180806-0040 $20.00; 180806-0040-VS Reference Number 033-0080404568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MIRIAM BAHENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MIRIAM BAHENA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(FAILURE TO SERVE)/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY OMERO BANUELOS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: TO OPEN SEPARATE PROBATE ACTION AND CONSOLIDATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDANCY ACTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIRIAM P BAHENA FOR LIS PENDENS; Minutes; Receipt: 180124-0947 $25.00; 180124-0947-VS Reference Number 033-0051006820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171211-0300 $29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIRIAM P BAHENA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0559 $435.00; 171004-0559-CK Reference Number CK 1062

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less