This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 21:03:40 (UTC).

BAGHDADY VS ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 BAGHDADY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESTRADA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4095

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HANY BAGHDADY

BAGHDADY, HANY

Defendants

MIGUEL ESTRADA

ESTRADA, MIGUEL

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DABE, FELMAN, DAGG ENHURST & EL

13743 Ventura Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Felman, Edward Luis

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

07/19/2019: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

07/19/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIGU

08/01/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIGU

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIGUEL ESTRADA FI

08/01/2019: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIGUEL ESTRADA FI

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

08/01/2019: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

08/01/2019: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

08/02/2019: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

08/02/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190802-0761; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. (MAILED IN SASE) 190802-0761-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190802-0761-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 312421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment (Possession Only) LLT; Comment; Comment: (7/19/2019 - 0001 - UDLUD Complaint <$10,000); Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: BAGHDADY, HANY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: Address in Court File; Awarded Against: ESTRADA, MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketDefault Packet Received; Comment: DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Judgment for Possession Entered; Comment: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF HANY BAGHDADY ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/19 JUDGMENT FOR: HANY BAGHDADY JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIGUEL ESTRADA JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MIGUEL ESTRADA. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) PLAINTIFF PREVAILS ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApp for Jmnt for restitution of premises only Pur to CCP1169; Comment: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketDefault Entered as to; Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED ON 000100 AS TO MIGUEL ESTRADA.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIGUEL ESTRADA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/23/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Prevails; Comment: PLAINTIFF PREVAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190719-0488; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $280.00; Total Payments and Credits: $280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $27.66.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $830.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 190719-0488-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 190719-0488-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 312349

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS