This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 03:11:36 (UTC).

BAGHDADY V. CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 BAGHDADY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHAVEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2462

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAGHDADY, HANY

Defendant

CHAVEZ, RITA

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DABE, FELMAN, DAGG ENHURST & EL

13743 Ventura Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Felman, Edward Luis

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

06/13/2019: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

05/13/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

05/09/2019: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

05/09/2019: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

05/09/2019: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

05/09/2019: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RITA

05/09/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RITA

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

04/30/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

04/30/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

04/30/2019: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLevying Officer Ntc of Writ of Possession Filed. Costs of:; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190513-0339; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. (MAILED IN SASE) 190513-0339-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190513-0339-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 312033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment (Possession Only) LLT; Comment; Comment: (4/30/2019 - 0001 - UDLUD Complaint <$10,000); Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: BAGHDADY, HANY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: Address in Court File; Awarded Against: CHAVEZ, RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketDefault Packet Received; Comment: DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Judgment for Possession Entered; Comment: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF HANY BAGHDADY ORDERED ENTERED 05/09/19 JUDGMENT FOR: HANY BAGHDADY JUDGMENT AGAINST: RITA CHAVEZ JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RITA CHAVEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) - ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApp for Jmnt for restitution of premises only Pur to CCP1169; Comment: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RITA CHAVEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 05/02/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190430-0639; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $280.00; Total Payments and Credits: $280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $26.66.--BEGINNING ON 04/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 190430-0639-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 190430-0639-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 311962

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS