This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 18:53:11 (UTC).

BADER-V-DISCOUNTRAMPS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 BADER-V-DISCOUNTRAMPS was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3509

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLIFFORD A BADER

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMAZON.COM, LLC

DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC

AMAZON.COM LLC

CHONGQING CHINBASEIMPORT & EXPORT CO. LTD

DISCOUNTRAMPS MARKET PLACES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGSTRON LIPSCOMB & LACK

10100 Santa Monica 16Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN

3890 Tenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

BERMAN BERMAN BERMANSCHNEIDER & LOWARY LLP

3890 Tenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

Cross Defendant Attorney

SCHNEIDER & LOWARY,LLP

3890 Tenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMAZON.COM, LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/23/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMAZON.COM, LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/23/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SCHNEIDER & LOWARY,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SCHNEIDER & LOWARY,LLP.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER BY AMAZON.COM, LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER BY AMAZON.COM, LLC

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/21/2016 OF AMAZON.COM LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/21/2016 OF AMAZON.COM LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2016 OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2016 OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC, ON 01/30/17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC.

ANSWER FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

ANSWER FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR WITH BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR AMAZON.COM, LLC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR WITH BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR AMAZON.COM, LLC.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CLIFFORD A BADER.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CLIFFORD A BADER.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/21/2016 OF AMAZON.COM LLC FILED BY AMAZON.COM LLC, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/21/2016 OF AMAZON.COM LLC FILED BY AMAZON.COM LLC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AMAZON.COM LLC, ON 11/22/16

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER FILED BY CLIFFORD A BADER, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER FILED BY CLIFFORD A BADER, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CLIFFORD A BADER, ON 01/03/17

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/29/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/29/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2016 OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2016 OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2016 OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC, ON 01/30/17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GINA GENATEMPO PRESENT FOR AMAZON.COM.; NO OTHER PARTIES ARE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.; COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT AMAZON TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2016 OF CLIFFORD BADER FILED BY CLIFFORD A BADER, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CLIFFORD A BADER, ON 01/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CLIFFORD A BADER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLIFFORD A BADER FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170106-0201 $9.00; 170106-0201-VS Reference Number 216071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/21/2016 OF AMAZON.COM LLC FILED BY AMAZON.COM LLC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AMAZON.COM LLC, ON 11/22/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT MAY NOT DISMISS CROSS COMPLAINT. ATTY IS FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR WITH BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR AMAZON.COM, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY DISCOUNTRAMPS.COM,LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BERMAN BERMAN BERMANSCHNEIDER &LOWARY LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMAZON.COM, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE AND JURY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160420-0821 $585.00; 160420-0821-CK Reference Number 4720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLIFFORD A BADER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160311-0278 $435.00; 160311-0278-CK Reference Number 0281024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.