This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:47:39 (UTC).

B OF A VS PADILLA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 B OF A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PADILLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7928

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, NA

Defendant

FELIX PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON FELIX PADILLA.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON FELIX PADILLA.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS(CCP 1033); ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS(CCP 1033); ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FELIX PADILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FELIX PADILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, NA FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, NA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, NA ORDERED ENTERED 12/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BANK OF AMERICA, NA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FELIX PADILLA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,092.71 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $439.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,532.21; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170919-0085 $380.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180129-0545 $25.00; 180129-0545-CK Reference Number 767185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON FELIX PADILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, NA AS TO FELIX PADILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS(CCP 1033); ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, NA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/14/2017 OF BANK OF AMERICA, NA ORDERED ENTERED 12/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BANK OF AMERICA, NA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FELIX PADILLA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,092.71 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $439.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,532.21; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FELIX PADILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,092.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170919-0085 $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less