This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:00:50 (UTC).

A&W GROUP -v- NATIONAL FLOORING, ETAL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 A W GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONAL FLOORING, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2264

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&W GROUP, INC.,

Defendants

NATIONAL FLOORING PRODUCTS,INC., A

CURTID GORDON

NATIONAL FLOORING PRODUCTS LLC, AN ENTITY

CURTIS GORDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOM F Y KING, ESQ

150 N Santa Anita Ave

Arcadia, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF A&W GROUP, INC., - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF A&W GROUP, INC., - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CURTIS GORDON SERVED ON 02/14/17 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PARTY CURTIS GORDON UPDATED: CORRECT FIRST NAME TO MATCH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF A&W GROUP, INC., FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF A&W GROUP, INC., - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY A&W GROUP, INC., FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0838 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.