This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 17:06:09 (UTC).

AVE-LLC -V- SOTELO

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 AVE-LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SOTELO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0719

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVE-LLC

Defendants

MARIO S BACILIO

GLORIA BACILIO

PEDRO SOTELO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT, WILLIAM

P O Box 1095

Victorville, CA 92393

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT THE WINDOW)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT THE WINDOW); Minutes; Receipt: 170623-0432 $25.00; 170623-0432-CK Reference Number 6410

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/03/2017 OF AVE-LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/03/2017 OF AVE-LLC FILED

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:52; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: C. HANCOCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; AVE-LLC REPRESENTED BY STAR MESA.; DEFENDANT MARIO S BACILIO, GLORIA BACILIO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PEDRO SOTELO; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: PENDING BANKRUPTCY; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY/TRIAL SET FOR 05/25/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER/PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER/PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY GLORIA BACILIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY GLORIA BACILIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER/PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER/PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY PEDRO SOTELO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY PEDRO SOTELO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170403-0896 $255.00; 170403-0896-VS Reference Number 026-0022434476

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 06/23/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT THE WINDOW); Minutes; Receipt: 170623-0432 $25.00; 170623-0432-CK Reference Number 6410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/03/2017 OF AVE-LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY/TRIAL; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; AVE-LLC REPRESENTED BY STAR MESA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PEDRO SOTELO, MARIO S BACILIO; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY/TRIAL.; 05A*ADRTHLD.; NOTICE OF RELIEF SUBMITTED TO COURT FOR REFERENCE.; STAR MESA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/03/2017 OF AVE-LLC ORDERED ENTERED 06/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AVE-LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PEDRO SOTELO; ------------------------------; MONEY JUDGMENT AS TO PEDRO SOTELO ONLY; -----------------------------; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $405.88 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $320.00 AND DAMAGES $2,101.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,327.48; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PEDRO SOTELO. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIO S BACILIO, GLORIA BACILIO; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIO S BACILIO, GLORIA BACILIO. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; ALL OTHER TENANTS IN POSSESSION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY/TRIAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:01; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; AVE-LLC REPRESENTED BY STAR MEZA.; DEFENDANT MARIO S BACILIO, GLORIA BACILIO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PEDRO SOTELO; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR GLORIA BACILIO. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/22/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; REASON: BANKRUPTCY STILL PENDING; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:52; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: C. HANCOCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; AVE-LLC REPRESENTED BY STAR MESA.; DEFENDANT MARIO S BACILIO, GLORIA BACILIO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PEDRO SOTELO; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: PENDING BANKRUPTCY; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY/TRIAL SET FOR 05/25/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY PEDRO SOTELO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PEDRO SOTELO IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/12/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY PEDRO SOTELO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170410-0576 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170403-0896 $255.00; 170403-0896-VS Reference Number 026-0022434476

    Read MoreRead Less