This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 14:50:12 (UTC).

AUTUMN D LA COTERA -N- LUIS F LA COTERA

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 AUTUMN D LA COTERA -N- LUIS F LA COTERA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5849

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AUTUMN D LA COTERA

Respondent

LUIS F LA COTERA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • VACATE HFAIL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/22 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • VACATE RSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/16/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • NEJ MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF AUTUMN LA COTERA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF AUTUMN LA COTERA ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS F LA COTERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LUIS F LA COTERA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • VACATE SDEF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SEE WHERE MARKED IN RED AND CORRECT. PLEASE RESUBMIT ONCE CORRECTED..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LUIS F LA COTERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/15/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0848 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less