Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 07:43:23 (UTC).

AURORA-V-REYES

Case Summary

On 05/17/2011 AURORA-V-REYES was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0266

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendant

EDITA REYES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BASS, DEBORAH

8961 Sunset Blvd Suite 2A

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAFFY BOULGOURJIAN

100 N Brand Blvd Ste 200

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESION RETURNED FROM SB COUNTY SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • OSC RE: VACATING JUDGMENT FILED BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, EDITA REYES; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES:; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2011 OF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/17/2011 OF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC ORDERED SET ASIDE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: STIPULATION OF PARTIES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SENT TO ATTY IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 110726-0645 $25.00; 110726-0645-CK Reference Number 7369

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2011 OF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2011 OF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC PRESENT; ATTORNEY RANDY SCHLOSSER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT EDITA REYES PRESENT; ATTORNEY RAFFY BOULGOURJIAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; CAUSE SETTLED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.; COURT ORDERS DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR 09/09/11.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 09/09/11; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: EDITA REYES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; HEARINGS:; OSC RE: VACATING JUDGMENT FILED BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC IS SET FOR 09/09/11AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; IF THERE IS NO APPEARANCE BY THE PARTIES, THE COURT WILL VACATE THE JUDGMENT IN THIS MATTER; AND DISMISS THIS CASE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110708-1586 $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. FILED BY DEFENDANT EDITA REYES; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RATHA KEA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LUAT CAO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY LUAT CAO FOR RAFFY BOULGOURJIAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED MOVING AND OPPOSING PAPERS REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; ON THE PLEADINGS.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENSE COUNSEL .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF COUNSEL .; EDITA REYES'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/17/2011 OF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC IS SET FOR 07/22/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS. FILED BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDITA REYES FOR MOTION AND FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 110613-3395 $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. FILED BY EDITA REYES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. FILED BY DEFENDANT EDITA REYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY EDITA REYES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF RAFFY BOULGOURJIAN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110609-0495 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110517-2136 $255.00; 110517-2136-CK Reference Number 4307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aurora Loan Services, LLC is a litigant