This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:01:47 (UTC).

AUDET -V- KRAFFT

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 AUDET -V- KRAFFT was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1349

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ILA AUDET

Defendant

LESLIE KRAFFT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM VAN ORDER, P.C.

145 South Carmalita Street

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GILSLEIDER, MCMAHON, MOLINEL

340 Commerce Ste 250

Irvine, CA 92602

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT

ANSWER FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF GILSLEIDER, MCMAHON, MOLINEL.

ANSWER FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF GILSLEIDER, MCMAHON, MOLINEL.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FAX NUMBER FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FAX NUMBER FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO LESLIE KRAFFT. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS CERTIFIED MAIL. WITH FEES OF $7.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO LESLIE KRAFFT. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS CERTIFIED MAIL. WITH FEES OF $7.00.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CONOR OBRIEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DOUGLAS YEE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LESLIE KRAFFT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD; COUNSEL INFORM THE COURT THAT THEY HAVE A MEDIATION CONFERENCE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 11, 2018.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S29; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CONOR OBRIEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MICHAEL HERZOG APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LESLIE KRAFFT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD; COUNSEL INTEND TO SET UP A PRIVATE MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FAX NUMBER FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DEFENDANT LESLIE KRAFFT FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR LESLIE KRAFFT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171213-0597 $150.00; 171213-0597-CK Reference Number CK 26756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY LESLIE KRAFFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LESLIE KRAFFT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171213-0593 $435.00; 171213-0593-CK Reference Number CK 26756

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO LESLIE KRAFFT. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS CERTIFIED MAIL. WITH FEES OF $7.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0039336077.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ILA AUDET FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0262 $3.50; 171030-0262-VS Reference Number 033-0039336077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ILA AUDET FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ILA AUDET FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0249 $435.00; 171030-0249-CK Reference Number CK 34016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less