This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 10:47:37 (UTC).

ASSSET CAPITAL -V- JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ASSSET CAPITAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHNNIE M MIMS-SIMMONS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1254

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A

Defendant

JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE, LAW OFFICES OF

8581 Santa Monica Blvd #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CC 1788.50 - FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CC 1788.50 - FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $269.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $8.43)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $269.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $8.43)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A ORDERED ENTERED 09/16/16; JUDGMENT FOR: ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,399.35 INTEREST $267.75 ATTORNEY FEES $689.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,661.10; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $174.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.61)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $174.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.61)

ORIGINAL CREDITORS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

ORIGINAL CREDITORS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A AS TO DOES ONLY

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.10)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.10)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/05/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/05/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $269.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $8.43)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,758.80) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 7065.71 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0693 $25.00; 170206-0693-CK Reference Number 202830

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $174.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.61)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( 6737.20 ); Minutes; Receipt: 161025-0274 $25.00; 161025-0274-CK Reference Number 195074

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 161014-0897 $25.00; 161014-0897-CK Reference Number 194652

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHNNIE M. MIMS-SIMMONS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/05/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0432 $240.00; 160201-0432-CK Reference Number #12530

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less