This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:39:31 (UTC).

ASSET CAPITAL-V-LOWERS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 ASSET CAPITAL-V-LOWERS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1569

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC

Defendant

MARK LOWERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE, LAW OFFICES OF

8581 Santa Monica Blvd #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/30/2017 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/30/2017 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/23/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARK LOWERS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,100.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $460.00 COSTS $261.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,821.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: SUPPORT OF OWNERSHIP AND CHAN OF TITLE FILED BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT 1788.50 FILED BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: C.C.P 1033 FILED BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT CIVIL CODE 1788.58 FILED BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARK LOWERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/30/2017 OF ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC AS TO MARK LOWERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0909 $196.00; 171031-0909-CK Reference Number 21514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less