This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 10:00:14 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE -V- LORETTA MONTES

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 ASSET ACCEPTANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LORETTA MONTES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4520

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

LORETTA MONTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D SCOTT CARRUTHERS

8488 Katella Ave P.O. Box 228

Stanton, CA 90680

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 110831-0580$25.00; 110831-0580-CK Reference Number 5026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • JUDGMENT PACKET SENT TO JUDGMENT SHELF FOR PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LORETTA MONTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC AS TO LORETTA MONTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/29/11; JUDGMENT FOR: ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LORETTA MONTES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,834.46 INTEREST $805.94 ATTORNEY FEES $433.44 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,378.84; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DECLARATION OF TOM TRANCHIDA IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO COMMENCE LEGAL ACTION FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LORETTA MONTES SERVED ON 05/18/11 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-1540$240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less