This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 10:54:32 (UTC).

ASCOT PARK-V-DOBOS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ASCOT PARK-V-DOBOS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0796

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASCOT PARK APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

MEGAN DOBOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST JOHN LLP

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1884 $255.00; 160201-1884-CK Reference Number 515738

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASCOT PARK APARTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/09/16; JUDGMENT FOR: ASCOT PARK APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MEGAN DOBOS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MEGAN DOBOS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SCS)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SCS)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MEGAN DOBOS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MEGAN DOBOS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MEGAN DOBOS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MEGAN DOBOS FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SCS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 160210-0305 $25.00; 160210-0305-CK Reference Number 516040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASCOT PARK APARTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/09/16; JUDGMENT FOR: ASCOT PARK APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MEGAN DOBOS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MEGAN DOBOS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MEGAN DOBOS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ASCOT PARK APARTMENTS, LLC AS TO MEGAN DOBOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MEGAN DOBOS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.83.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1884 $255.00; 160201-1884-CK Reference Number 515738

    Read MoreRead Less