This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 00:55:00 (UTC).

ARROW FINANCIAL -V- ULISES ROMERO

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 ARROW FINANCIAL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ULISES ROMERO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4162

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

ROMERO, ULISES

Assignee

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARK D WALSH

5030 Camino De La Siesta #340

San Diego, CA 92108

Walsh, Mark D

Assignee Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICES OFROBERT J. COLCLOUGH, III

9301 Oakdale Ave Ste 205

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Law Offices of Robert J Colclough III

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert J Colclough III

 

Court Documents

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTER

08/01/2019: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTER

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC, FOR INTE

08/01/2019: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC, FOR INTE

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT, OLD CASE CIVRS913827

08/01/2019: ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT, OLD CASE CIVRS913827

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT, OLD CASE CIVRS913827

08/01/2019: ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT, OLD CASE CIVRS913827

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

08/15/2019: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON

09/06/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

09/06/2019: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED WITH

07/17/2020: WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED WITH

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

08/21/2020: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialLVNV FUNDING, LLC; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2020-00318; LVNV FUNDING, LLC; $46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialLVNV FUNDING, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $6.00 Credit Card paid on 11/17/2020 for fax filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $40.00 Credit Card paid on 11/17/2020 for Writ of Execution Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs $0.00/Credit $0.00/Interest $634.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Orange; Comment: WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200122-0399; ConversionPayment; $4.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200122-0397; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $4.77

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $68.04; Total Payments and Credits: $68.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialLVNV FUNDING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $46.00; Total Payments and Credits: $46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComment: (Imaged); Comment: ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT, OLD CASE CIVRS913827 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC FOR COPIES/FAX/POSTAGE 190815-0787-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.55 PAYMT 190815-0787-VS TSB/ 0.02 FAX/ 6.00 PAYMT 190815-0787-VS FCP/ 1.50 PAYMT 190815-0787-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0145629688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC FOR APP FOR ROJ 190815-0785-VS MFF/ 30.00 PAYMT 190815-0785-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0145629688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC FOR APP FOR ROJ 190815-0769-CK MFF/ 30.00 PAYMT 190815-0769-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 143142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Comment: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC, FOR INTEREST $296235.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 03/02/10 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT LVNV FUNDING, LLC HAVE & RECOVER FROM ULISES ROMERO: JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,262.61 INTEREST $2,962.35 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6254.96 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH