This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/24/2018 at 10:11:07 (UTC).

ARNOLD -V- MERRICK BANK

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 ARNOLD filed an Other lawsuit against MERRICK BANK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2568

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN ARNOLD

Defendant

MERRICK BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KROHN & MOSS, LTD

1112 Ocean Dr Suite 301

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • FILE RECD IN VV - PLACED ON FILE BACK SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • FILE RETURNED TO VV VIA COURT COURIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SAN ARNOLD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ETC FILED AS TO MERRICK BANK. PARTY SERVED ON 05/16/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL CORPORATE SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110505-0302 $240.00; 110505-0302-CK Reference Number 28639

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less