This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 19:03:47 (UTC).

ARMSBY-V-RALKE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 ARMSBY-V-RALKE was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0871

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHY R. ARMSBY

Defendants

TERRY RALKE

RICHARD A. RALKE

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RICHARD A. RALKE.

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RICHARD A. RALKE.

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY TERRY RALKE.

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY TERRY RALKE.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:55; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JENNIFER GARNER; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KATHY R. ARMSBY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- KATHY ARMSBY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE.; JUDGMENT FOR: KATHY R. ARMSBY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $157.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,157.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO RICHARD A. RALKE. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO RICHARD A. RALKE. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO TERRY RALKE. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO TERRY RALKE. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170518-0056 $75.00; 170518-0056-VS Reference Number 026-0042287301

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 07/20/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KATHY R. ARMSBY FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170925-0135 $2.00; 170925-0135-MC Reference Number 026 0069502320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; 09:42; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KATHY R. ARMSBY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; RICHARD A. RALKE'S MOTION TO VACATE IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; 09:42; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KATHY R. ARMSBY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; TERRY RALKE'S MOTION TO VACATE IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170912-0933 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RICHARD A. RALKE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY TERRY RALKE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KATHY R. ARMSBY FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170906-0800 $3.00; 170906-0800-VS Reference Number 026-0066362384

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KATHY R. ARMSBY FOR COPY - FAX - POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0624 $4.71; 170823-0624-MC Reference Number 026 0063967543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KATHY R. ARMSBY FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0610 $25.00; 170823-0610-MC Reference Number 026 0063967543

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:55; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JENNIFER GARNER; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KATHY R. ARMSBY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- KATHY ARMSBY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE.; JUDGMENT FOR: KATHY R. ARMSBY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD A. RALKE, TERRY RALKE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $157.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,157.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO RICHARD A. RALKE. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO TERRY RALKE. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0898 $5.00; 170714-0898-MC Reference Number 026-0057216669

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KATHY R. ARMSBY FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170518-0073 $7.00; 170518-0073-VS Reference Number 026-0042287301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170518-0056 $75.00; 170518-0056-VS Reference Number 026-0042287301

    Read MoreRead Less