This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 19:08:49 (UTC).

ARMANDO GARCIA VS SOUTHWEST REG

Case Summary

On 01/21/2010 ARMANDO GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHWEST REG. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0613

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Intervenors and Plaintiffs

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ROLAND MARTINEZ

ARMANDO GARCIA

Defendants

ASHVIN PANDYA

SOUTHWEST REGIONALCOUNCIL OF CARPENTERS

SUNNY ASHVIN PANDYA

LINDSEY MALDOON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSSIAN, ROBERSON,KIM BALL & JALTO

3251 Old Conejo Rd

Newbury Park, CA 91320

LAW OFFICES OF AMEER A SHAH

9121 Haven Ave Suite 150

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

PAUL F GLASS

206 N. Jackson St Suite 100

Glendale, CA 91206

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY & GMELICH

700 N Brand Boulevard 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2012
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SUNNY ASHVIN PANDYA HAS BEEN DISMISSED -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): COMPLAINT WAS DISMISSED ON 05/31/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY SOUTHWEST REGIONALCOUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, LINDSEY MALDOON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT AS TO EVEREST COMPLAINT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY NUSS; COURT REPORTER FRED BERZAK 5815; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; PAUL F GLASS FOR ARMANDO GARCIA NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY JOHN FLOCK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SOUTHWEST REGIONALCOUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, LINDSEY MALDOON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL THE COURT DISMISSES THE CASE.; VACATE FRCMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/31/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • REQ FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): REQUIRES ALL ATTORNEYS SIGNATURES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 07/21/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 05/16/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF OSC HR RE DISMISSAL FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • VACATE FRCMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY LINDSEY MALDOON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BRADLEY & GMELICH.; Minutes; Receipt: 100402-0137 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED AS TO LINDSEY MALDOON. PARTY SERVED ON 03/11/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/22/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY SOUTHWEST REGIONALCOUNCIL OF CARPENTERS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BRADLEY & GMELICH.; Minutes; Receipt: 100305-5176 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SOUTHWEST REGIONALCOUNCIL OF CARPENTERS SERVED ON 02/03/10 WITH FEES OF $42.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY ARMANDO GARCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/21/2010 OF ARMANDO GARCIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100126-3893 $355.00; 100126-3893-CK Reference Number 2477

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.