This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:18:37 (UTC).

ARLENE SANTOYO CARDENAS -N- ALEXANDRO SANTOYO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 ARLENE SANTOYO CARDENAS -N- ALEXANDRO SANTOYO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8654

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARLENE SANTOYO CARDENAS

Respondent

ALEXANDRO SANTOYO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. ENTIRE ACTION IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES.; Minutes; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON PAYMENT OF COURT FEES $435.00.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - OTHER DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (FL); ENTIRE CASE DISPOSITIONED BY DISMISSAL (FL, PROB, MEN); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • ORDER RFA 10/30/17 - GRANTED CERTIFCATE AND ORDER TO VACATE PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • VACATE NFF2 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT FWSF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SENT.; Minutes; YOUR FORMS ARE BEING RETURNED TO YOU BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): IF SUBMITTING VIA; FAX YOU NEED TO CCOMPLETE ALL OF MC-050 INCLUDING #3 TO CHARGE FOR FAX FILING FEES. ON; FL-115 MISSING ADDRESS ON HEADING AND ADDRESS OF WHERE REESPONDENT WAS SERVED. ALSO #4 IS; INCOMPLETE. PLEASE SEE ALL RED MARKS FOR COMPLETION . THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • COURT ALLOWS ARLENE SANTOYO CARDENAS TO MAKE PAYMENTS ON FEES OF $435.00 BEGINNING ON 10/30/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF ARLENE SANTOYO CARDENAS IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ARLENE SANTOYO CARDENAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less