This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:05:28 (UTC).

ARENAS-V-RUVALCABA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 ARENAS-V-RUVALCABA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9399

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELLE ARENAS

Defendants

MARTIN RUVALCABA

MICHELLE ELIZABETH ALEXANDROWICZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LALEZARY LAW FIRM,LLP

280 South Beverly Dr Ste 400

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA, LLP

12100 Wilshire Blvd #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DANIELLE ARENAS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DANIELLE ARENAS.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/SANCTIONS(PLA COUNSEL FTS)/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALEXANDER BORIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DANIELLE ARENAS.; ATTORNEY JENNIFER MCDONAGH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARTIN RUVALCABA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF INDICATES A DEFAULT WILL BE FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALEXANDROWWICZ AS SOON AS; POSSIBLE.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY ALL PARTIES.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS.; IF COUNSEL ARE AMENABLE TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, THE COURT ORDERS MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED 30 DAYS; PRIOR TO THE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/26/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/30/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DANIELLE ARENAS.; Minutes; Receipt: 180801-0621 $150.00; 180801-0621-CK Reference Number 37137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY DANIELLE ARENAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARTIN RUVALCABA FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 180725-0683 $435.00; 180725-0683-CK Reference Number 172498

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MARTIN RUVALCABA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MARTIN RUVALCABA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MARTIN RUVALCABA.; Minutes; Receipt: 180725-0681 $150.00; 180725-0681-CK Reference Number 172498

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DEFENDANT MARTIN RUVALCABA FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DANIELLE ARENAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DANIELLE ARENAS.; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0492 $150.00; 171004-0492-CK Reference Number CK 31170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DANIELLE ARENAS FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0490 $435.00; 171004-0490-CK Reference Number CK 31170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less