Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 22:01:02 (UTC).

ARCELIA MACIEL -N- RAMON HERMOSILLO

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 ARCELIA MACIEL -N- RAMON HERMOSILLO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7602

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARCELIA MACIEL

Respondent

RAMON HERMOSILLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HRG BY MAIL SRV ON 04/17/18 AS TO ARCELIA M MACIEL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 03/27/18 IN DEPT CS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ARCELIA MACIEL RE: CC/CV/CS (083117); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN A CRAWLEY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: NORMA MAGANA; COURT REPORTER ANNA TULCAN 12875; BAILIFF: T SMITH-HAGANS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN SKIDMORE PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ARCELIA MACIEL, RAMON HERMOSILLO; PROCEEDINGS:; MODIFICATION HEARING HELD.; ACTION CAME ON FOR RFO CC/CV/CS (083117) BY PETITIONER.; 09:19; NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY.; ARCELIA MACIEL'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: CC/CV/CS (083117) IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: RETURNED JUDGMENT AS TO ARECELIA MACIEL RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • UPDATE JURISDICTION TO KS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: FL-141: MISSING DATE AND SIGNATURE.; REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER IS MISSING A DATE AND SIGNATURE. FL-170: SINCE YOU ARE; RECEIVING PUBLIC ASSISTANCE A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NEEDS TO SIGN THE; PROPOSED JUDGMENT. MISSING THE DATE AND SIGNATURE FOR THE PETITIONER. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.; ALSO PLEASE MAKE SURE ALL ENVELOPES ARE ADDRESSED FOR BOTH PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RAMON HERMOSILLO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/31/2017 OF ARCELIA MACIEL AS TO RAMON HERMOSILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ARCELIA MACIEL IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • ARCELIA MACIEL, RAMON HERMOSILLO IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ARCELIA MACIEL RE: CC/CV/CS (083117).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ARCELIA MACIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S44

    Read MoreRead Less