This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:35:24 (UTC).

APARICIO -V- BERNAL/CASILLAS

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 APARICIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BERNAL/CASILLAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5265

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAN APARICIO

GLORIA APARICIO

Defendants

MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL

ESTHER M. CASILLAS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LIDDLE & LIDDLE

310 South Vermont Ave

Glendora, CA 91741

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0945 $25.00; 170823-0945-CK Reference Number 17480

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:01; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY WINTER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF DAN APARICIO ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DAN APARICIO, GLORIA APARICIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS; NO MONEY JUDGMENT; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/04/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 11:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL SERVED ON 07/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL SERVED ON 07/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ESTHER M. CASILLAS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/28/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ESTHER M. CASILLAS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/28/17

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0076 $255.00; 170728-0076-CK Reference Number 17253

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0945 $25.00; 170823-0945-CK Reference Number 17480

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:01; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY WINTER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF DAN APARICIO ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DAN APARICIO, GLORIA APARICIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS; NO MONEY JUDGMENT; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/04/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 11:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • PARTY ESTHER M. CASILLAS UPDATED: CORRECT FIRST NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • POS/DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF DAN APARICIO AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ESTHER M. CASILLAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY MARCELINO JUAN BERNAL, ESTHER M. CASILLAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $685.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $22.83.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0076 $255.00; 170728-0076-CK Reference Number 17253

    Read MoreRead Less