Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/04/2018 at 17:25:41 (UTC).

ANTHONY LUCAS -V- WEST VALLEY DETENTION

Case Summary

On 12/28/2010 ANTHONY LUCAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WEST VALLEY DETENTION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3676

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY LUCAS

Defendants

WEST VALLEY DETENTION FACILITY

SAN BERNARDINO SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY JAIL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDERS DATED 7/8/11;7/29/11;10/7/11 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • LETTER DATED 10/7/11 FROM ANTHONY LUCAS REGARDING STATUS OF CASE. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • HEARING RE: CMC/SERVICE COMPLETION/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MINUTES UPDATED BY MARLENE GALINDO; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER LAURA SANDERS 12273; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; PRO/PER FOR ANTHONY LUCAS NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; NO APPEARANCE.; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OD 7-29-11 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • HEARING RE: SERVICE COMPLETION/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER MICHELE WATSON 10280; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY LUCAS; SONIA LUCAS (WIFE) IS PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT IS ADVISED PLAINTIFF WAS CONVICTED OF 1ST DEGREE BURGLARY AND IS SCHEDULED TO BE; SENTENCED ON 8-11-11.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: CMC/SERVICE COMPLETION/DISMISSAL SET FOR 10/07/11 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT R12.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 7-8-11 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • UPDATE PARTY ADDRESS FOR ANTHONY LUCAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • LETTER DATED 7-5-11 FROM ANTHONY LUCAS REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF 7-29-11 HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • HEARING RE: WRITTEN REQUEST TO RESET HEARING SET 7-29-11; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED PLAINTIFFS LETTER DATED 7-5-11 AND DENIES SAME WITHOUT; PREJUDICE. HEARING DATE OF 7-29-11 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT R12 IS CONFIRMED.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: 5/27/11 MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED BACK FROM ANTHONY LUCAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2010
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANTHONY LUCAS FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY LUCAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY LUCAS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN BERNARDINO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where San Bernardino County is a litigant