This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:05:02 (UTC).

ANTHONY BATISTE -N- LISA BATISTE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ANTHONY BATISTE -N- LISA BATISTE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0266

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE

Respondent

LISA DENISE BATISTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 11/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF ANTHONY BATISTE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF ANTHONY BATISTE ORDERED ENTERED 11/08/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT/NOE/SASE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE RE: OTH:SET ASIDE 1ST AMENDED PETITION/POS/SIGN PROP JGMT (102717); Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JAMES BRUCE MINTON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: BECKY GENOVESI; COURT REPORTER FRANCES MACIAS 10918; BAILIFF: T ZISKE; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LISA DENISE BATISTE; PROCEEDINGS:; ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: OTH:SET ASIDE 1ST AMD PET/POS/SIGN PRP JUD IS HEARD; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- ANTHONY BATISTE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: SET ASIDE 1ST AMENDED PETITION IS GRANTED; COURT FINDS:; DATE OF MARRIAGE: MAY 18, 2012; DATE OF SEPARATION: AUGUST 1, 2014; THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY LISA DENISE BATISTE ON 02/22/16; BY FILING OF SERVICE OF PROCESS.; DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES; COURT AWARDS NO SPOUSAL SUPPORT TO PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT, AND JURISDICTION TO AWARD SPOUSAL; SUPPORT IS HEREBY TERMINATED.; THERE IS NO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT.; THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; THE PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES OF THE PARTIES SHALL BE AS FOLLOWS:; SOLE PHYSICAL AND LEGAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN SHALL BE AWARDED TO ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE.; NO VISITATION IS ORDERED FOR MOTHER/LISA BATISTE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.; PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.; NOTICE - CAUTION: YOU ARE NOT OFFICIALLY DIVORCED UNTIL JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY A JUDICIAL OFFICER INDICATING THE OFFICIAL DATE OF THE TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE.; THE COURT RETURNS THE JUDGMENT, AS IT IS AN AMENDED JUDGMENT.; PETITIONER TO PREPARE JUDGMENT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RFO;BLNK RESP DECL BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/01/17 AS TO LISA DENISE BATISTE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE RE: OTH:SET ASIDE 1ST AMENDED PETITION/POS/SIGN PROP JGMT (102717).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDER AS TO RFO FILED ON 102717 FILED BY ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL DENIED FEE WAIVER AND DENIED FEE WAIVER PACKET TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANTHONY WILLIAMS BATISTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less