This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/30/2018 at 12:12:42 (UTC).

ANTHONY ANDERSON -V- C AND H DRIFTWOOD DAIRY, ET A

Case Summary

On 07/11/2014 ANTHONY ANDERSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against C AND H DRIFTWOOD DAIRY, ET A. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0335

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY ANDERSON

Defendants

C AND H DRIFTWOOD DAIRY

NAM SUP LEE

DRIFTWOOD DAIRY INC

TORRES TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF H JSIMS DBA ADA LAW GROUP

41593 Winchester Rd Suite 200

Temecula, CA 92590

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON C AND H DRIFTWOOD DAIRY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/18/14 WITH COSTS OF $120.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NAM SUP LEE SERVED ON 07/18/14 WITH FEES OF $120.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2014 OF ANTHONY ANDERSON, TORRES TRUST IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY ANDERSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY ANDERSON IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANTHONY ANDERSON FOR COURT FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.