This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 00:42:23 (UTC).

ANNA MARIA OCHOA -N- ANDREA MARIE OCHOA

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 ANNA MARIA OCHOA -N- ANDREA MARIE OCHOA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3053

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANNA MARIA OCHOA

Respondent

ANDREA MARIE OCHOA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • NEJ MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/12/2017 OF ANNA OCHOA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/12/2017 OF ANNA OCHOA ORDERED ENTERED 12/04/17; ACTION - COMPLETE; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/12/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANNA MARIA OCHOA FOR POSTAGE/ENVELOPE; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0538 $2.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANNA MARIA OCHOA FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANNA MARIA OCHOA FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MISSING FL-141-MANDATORY FORM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION OF JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; THE DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 6/7 TO RESPOND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANDREA MARIE OCHOA SERVED ON 04/24/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANNA MARIA OCHOA FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANNA MARIA OCHOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANNA MARIA OCHOA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.