This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 00:33:00 (UTC).

ANN-MARIE ALBERT -V- TABITHA STORRS

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 ANN-MARIE ALBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TABITHA STORRS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0553

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANN-MARIE ALBERT

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TABITHA STORRS

CHRISTOPHER PHILIP BURTON

JESSICA PHILLIPS

CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAN M GHALEB

110 Pine Avenue Suite 1000

Long Beach, CA 90802

LAW OFFICES OF ALAN M. GHALEB

110 Pine Avenue, Suite 1000

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HOMAN & STONE

12 North Fifth St

Redlands, CA 92373

BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

SUSSON PARRETT & ODELL

18201 Von Karman Ave Ste 400

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS FILED BY TABITHA STORRS, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS FILED BY TABITHA STORRS, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TABITHA STORRS, ON 04/20/17

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS FILED BY TABITHA STORRS, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS FILED BY TABITHA STORRS, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TABITHA STORRS, ON 04/20/17

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON BY JESSICA PHILLIPS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON BY JESSICA PHILLIPS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON BY JESSICA PHILLIPS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON BY JESSICA PHILLIPS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON FILED BY CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON FILED BY CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON, ON 03/17/17

ANSWER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUSSON PARRETT & ODELL.

ANSWER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUSSON PARRETT & ODELL.

ANSWER FILED BY TABITHA STORRS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE.

ANSWER FILED BY TABITHA STORRS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE.

ANSWER FILED BY TABITHA STORRS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE.

ANSWER FILED BY TABITHA STORRS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE.

ANSWER FILED BY JESSICA PHILLIPS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY JESSICA PHILLIPS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

NOTICE OF ANSWER TO THE CROSS COMPLAINT OF BURTON SENT.

NOTICE OF ANSWER TO THE CROSS COMPLAINT OF BURTON SENT.; Minutes; THE CROSS COMPLAINT OF BURTON HAS NOT BEEN FILED BY THE COURT. THE ORDER WAS SIGNED BY; THE COURT BUT IT HAS NOT BEEN PROCESSING BY THE CLERKS OFFICE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER PHILIP BURTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/05/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER PHILIP BURTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/05/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT AND UNDERLYING COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 05/03/16 AS TO BONNIE MOSS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT AND UNDERLYING COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 05/03/16 AS TO BONNIE MOSS, FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY TABITHA STORRS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY TABITHA STORRS.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/24/2015 OF ANN-MARIE ALBERT BY TABITHA STORRS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/24/2015 OF ANN-MARIE ALBERT BY TABITHA STORRS

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (RE: SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL CERTIFICATE & ORDER TO VACATE DOCUMENTS/DISMISSAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO CC OF STORRS & BURTON VACATED PER ORDR ON 04/25/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2016 OF TABITHA STORRS FILED BY TABITHA STORRS, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TABITHA STORRS, ON 04/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF CHRISTOPHER BURTON FILED BY CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP BURTON, ON 03/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN M. GHALEB PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO EFFECT SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/21/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 150727-0718 $2.00; 150727-0718-MC Reference Number 023-0234040674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANN-MARIE ALBERT FOR FAX COPY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 150727-0707 $14.00; 150727-0707-MC Reference Number 023-0234040674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANN-MARIE ALBERT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 150727-0700 $435.00; 150727-0700-MC Reference Number 023-0234040674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.