This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:45:51 (UTC).

ANGELA RIVERA -N- ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 ANGELA RIVERA -N- ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1012

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELA RIVERA

Respondent

ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 05/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF ANGELA RIVERA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF ANGELA RIVERA ORDERED ENTERED 05/14/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: MISSING PAGE 2&3 FOR DECLARATION FOR; DEFAULT FORM FL-170.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANGELA RIVERA FOR PRELIMINARY & FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF ANGELA RIVERA AS TO ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS/PETITION/UCCJEA FILED AS TO ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ROBERT ANTHONY MONTEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANGELA RIVERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANGELA RIVERA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANGELA RIVERA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.