This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/29/2017 at 07:22:12 (UTC).

Angela Olvera-v-juan Perez

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Angela Olvera-v-juan Perez in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2408

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Olvera

Defendants

Juan M Perez

Danielle Perez

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 10/03/17 AS TO ANGELA OLVERA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 10/03/17 AS TO ANGELA OLVERA, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JUAN M PEREZ, DANIELLE PEREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JUAN M PEREZ, DANIELLE PEREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0721 $259.50; 170927-0721-CK Reference Number 664

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • REQ TO SET/POS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): EACH DEF MUST HAVE A PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS,P LEASE DO NOT LIST TOGETHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 026-0072656039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANGELA OLVERA FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 171012-0874 $8.00; 171012-0874-VS Reference Number 026-0072656039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JUAN M PEREZ FOR FIRST APPARENCE FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DANIELLE PEREZ FOR FIRST APPARENCE FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JUAN M PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DANIELLE PEREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 10/03/17 AS TO ANGELA OLVERA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JUAN M PEREZ, DANIELLE PEREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $35.00.--BEGINNING ON 09/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0721 $259.50; 170927-0721-CK Reference Number 664

    Read MoreRead Less