This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/30/2018 at 14:00:52 (UTC).

ANGELA MEZA -V- CITY OF ONTARIO

Case Summary

On 06/02/2010 ANGELA MEZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF ONTARIO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6034

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELA MEZA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JOHNNY A FARIAS

DAVID J HUDSON

CITY OF ONTARIO

ALEJANDRO FARIAS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CITY OF ONTARIO

ROES 1 - 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GENE J GOLDSMAN

501 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BEVINS, HELLESEN &GLAUSER

560 E Hospitality Lane Suite 460

San Bernardino, CA 92408-3545

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNB MCCARTHY JR

4685 Macarthur Court #200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LAW OFFICES OF GOLDY BERGER

5655 Lindero Canyon Road Suite 521-12

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Cross Defendant Attorney

BENTLER MULDER LLP

450 N Brand Blvd Suite 600

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE IS ALREADY DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION (060214) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF ONTARIO; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FERNANDO BRITO JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF.; ATTORNEY TAYLOR L. EMERSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; CITY OF ONTARIO'S MOTION RE: RELIEF FROM ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION IS HEARD.; COURT GIVES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS:; CITY OF ONTARIO'S MOTION RE: RELIEF FROM ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION IS DENIED.; THE MANDATORY PROVISION OF CCP SECTION 473(B) DOES NOT APPLY BECAUSE DEFENDANT DOES NOT SEEK; RELIEF FROM A DEFAULT, DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL. AS FOR DISCRETIONARY RELIEF, DEFENSE; COUNSELS DECLARATION PROVIDES NO FACTS TO EXPLAIN HOW OR WHY SHE NEGLECTED TO CHECK THE; PROPER FILING DEADLINES FOR OPPOSING THE PETITION TO CONFIRM THE ARBITRATION COSTS AWARD.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION PLACED IN LEGAL RESE ARCH BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION PLACED IN LEGAL RESEARCH BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: RELIEF FROM ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/18/14 FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER BY MAIL ON 08/05/14 AS TO JUDICATE WEST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: RELIEF F/ORD CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD SET FOR HEARING ON 08/18/14, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELA MEZA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ANGELA MEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY ANGELA MEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BERGER & RAPHAEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/01/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CITY OF ONTARIO. PARTY SERVED ON 06/14/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100602-4195 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less