This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 05:17:32 (UTC).

ANANSA SIMS -N- DAVID B. PATTERSON JR.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 ANANSA SIMS -N- DAVID B PATTERSON JR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4061

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Other

ANANSA SIMS

Respondents and Others

DAVID B PATTERSON JR

ANANSA SIMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

VASQUEZ, DAVID

300 E. State St #520

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ANANSA SIMS RE: CS/SS (6/21/17); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ANANSA SIMS RE: CC/CV (062317); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • VACATE RFOF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S51.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED TRACKED TO PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/11/2017 OF ANANSA SIMS FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/11/2017 OF ANANSA SIMS ORDERED ENTERED 12/20/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ANANSA SIMS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANANSA SIMS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANANSA SIMS FOR FIRST APP FEES/RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF ANANSA SIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANANSA SIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANANSA SIMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.